IL HB3652 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971 and the State Pension Funds Continuing Appropriation Act. Beginning July 1, 2010, requires the Department of Central Management Services to administer a program of health benefits coverage for retirees, and their dependents, of certain community college districts previously not participating in the Community College Health Insurance Security Fund. Beginning January 1, 2010, provides for the collection and use of contributions. Beginning July 1, 2009, establishes a committee to advise the State on the program and necessary adjustments in funding sources. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
ST GROUP INS-COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-04-01 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2009-04-01 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-24 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |