IL HB3642 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section regarding property tax exemptions for charitable purposes, provides that property held by a charitable organization for the purpose of constructing or rehabilitating residences for eventual transfer to qualified low-income families through sale, lease, or contract for deed is exempt from property tax as a charitable purpose. Provides that the exemption commences on the day title to the property is transferred to the organization and continues to the end of the levy year in which the organization transfers title to the property to a qualified low-income family. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TAX-CHARITABLE REHAB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3642&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3642.htm |