IL HB3629 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Creates the Transition and Emergency Home Services Article. Provides that within 4 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Department of Human Services shall create a program to provide nursing services and assistance with activities of daily living sufficient to allow individuals who otherwise qualify for placement in a nursing facility to receive short-term services in the community. Provides that the short-term services shall cover both: (1) emergency home services for individuals currently receiving home services who experience a temporary need for a substitute personal assistant because of the unavailability of their other home services providers; and (2) short-term services to bridge periods between release from medical or institutional settings and establishment of long-term home services under a State waiver or other arrangements that allow the individual to live in the community. Provides that a person receiving benefits under Title XVI of the Social Security Act and residing in a facility, shall receive a personal needs allowance of $90 per monthly, with the Department providing $60 per month in addition to the amount required under Title XVI of the Social Security Act. Provides that facility owners, management, and employees are prohibited from retaliating against facility residents or employees who complain about facility services, including the facility's physical condition, medical care, social supports and services, access to visitation and time outside the facility, and any other attribute connected to a resident's experience of living in a facility. Makes other changes.
Title
NURSING HOME-TRANSITION CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-02 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 5-101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 45 | 5-105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 45 | 5-110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 45 | Art. V heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3629&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3629.htm |