IL HB3628 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the Public Community College Act. Moves provisions governing classes for adults and youths whose schooling has been interrupted from the School Code to the Public Community College Act. Amends the Adult Education Act. Defines "Adult Education" (rather than "Adult and Continuing Education") to mean academic instruction and educational services below the postsecondary level that increase an individual's ability to (i) read, write, and speak in English and perform mathematics or other activities necessary for the attainment of a secondary school diploma or its recognized equivalent and (ii) transition to postsecondary education and training or obtain employment. Provides for apportionment for adult education courses for the instruction of those persons who (i) are 16 years of age or older, are not enrolled or required to be enrolled in a secondary school under State law, and are basic-skills deficient, (ii) do not have a secondary school diploma or its recognized equivalent and have not achieved an equivalent level of education, or (iii) are an English language learner (rather than persons over 21 years of age and youths under 21 years of age whose schooling has been interrupted). Repeals the Adult Education Reporting Act. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ICCB-ADULT EDUCATION CLASSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0289 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 020-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 405 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 2-1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 2-2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 2-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 3-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 3-2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 3-3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 410 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-12.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |