IL HB3620 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, in determining income eligibility for child care benefits beginning in State fiscal year 2022, the income threshold shall be no less than 200% of the then-current federal poverty level for each family size. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
DHS-CHILD CARE-INCOME LEVELS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0491 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Healthcare Access and Availability; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 007-002-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 007-004-000 |
2021-03-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 9A-2a | New Code | See Bill Text |