IL HB3619 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the tax imposed on mid-range ethanol blends applies to (i) 80% of the proceeds of sales made on or after July 1, 2019 and on or before December 31, 2023 and (ii) 100% of the proceeds of sales made thereafter. Provides that the term "mid-range ethanol blend" means a blend of gasoline and denatured ethanol that contains not less than 20% but less than 51% denatured ethanol. Makes changes to the definitions of "gasohol" and "majority blended ethanol fuel" to adjust the required percentage of ethanol. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-MID-RANGE ETHANOL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-14 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |