IL HB3616 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Film Production Services Tax Credit Act of 2008. Provides that an accredited production may not include intense or persistent depictions of firearm violence. Provides for the recapture of credits if the taxpayer fails to comply with the provisions of the Act because the production includes intense or persistent depictions of firearm violence. Effective immediately.
Title
FILM TAX CREDIT-FIREARMS
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 16 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 16 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 16 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3616&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3616.htm |