IL HB3608 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is a Class 4 felony for a sex offender as defined in the Sex Offender Registration Act to knowingly be employed by a public or private university, college, or community college.
Title
SEX OFFENDER-NO COLLEGE EMPLOY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2015-03-18 | House | Tabled |
2015-03-18 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-03-17 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3608&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3608.htm |