IL HB3601 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that students in grades 11 and 12 of East St. Louis School District 189 may take courses at Southwestern Illinois College for dual credit at no cost to the student. Amends the Public Community College Act to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD/COMM COLL-SW IL COLLEGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-000
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Community College Access & Affordability Committee; 007-000-000
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Community College Access & Affordability Committee; 006-001-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105522-83New CodeSee Bill Text
1108053-29.11New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback