IL HB3600 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a non-public school to perform a check of the Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database (in addition to the Statewide Sex Offender Database) for each applicant for employment to determine whether the applicant has been adjudicated of a sex offense or of a murder or other violent crime against youth. Provides that the checks must be conducted once for every 5 years that an applicant remains employed. Extends the teacher qualification provisions for preschool educational program grants to the 2028-2029 school year (rather than the 2023-2024 school year). Provides that a school district may adopt a policy to waive tuition costs for a non-resident pupil if the pupil is a child of a district employee. Provides that, until June 30, 2028 (rather than June 30, 2023), applicants may apply to the State Board of Education for issuance of a 5-year, Short-Term Substitute Teaching License; makes other changes. Makes changes concerning the Alternative Educator Licensure Program. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-IN SCHOOL SUSPENSION
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-06-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-06-26 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 013-000-000 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Education |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Re-assigned to Education |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-016-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.6c | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.6d | New Code | See Bill Text |