IL HB3580 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Reshore Our Supply Chains Tax Reform Act. In specified provisions concerning base income, provides that a taxpayer may claim a depreciation deduction for federal income tax purposes.
Title
RESHORE OUR SUPPLY CHAINS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3580&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3580.htm |