IL HB3578 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the court shall impose an extended term sentence when a defendant is convicted of first degree murder, second degree murder, or involuntary manslaughter in which the victim of any of these offenses was a person under 18 years of age and the death of the victim resulted from child abuse. Provides that before the imposition of an extended term sentence, the State's Attorney shall present evidence to the court at the sentencing hearing of the defendant describing the facts in the case. Provides that if the court finds that the death of the person under 18 years of age was the result of child abuse, the court shall impose an extended term sentence upon the defendant. Provides that if the court does not make the finding, the court shall impose any other sentence for the offense as prescribed in the Code. Defines "abuse".
Title
CD CORR-DEATH MINOR-SENTENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-5-3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3578&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3578.htm |