IL HB3536 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Joliet Regional Port District Act. Provides that at least one of the Governor's appointees and at least one of the County Executive of Will County's appointees to the Joliet Regional Port District Board shall be from within the corporate boundaries of the Village of Romeoville. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JOLIET REGIONAL PORT DISTRICT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-29HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-05-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-04-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-20SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70182515Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback