IL HB3522 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-12 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-12 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
PEN CD-FIRE-DEFINED CONTRIBUTE
Sponsors
Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | To |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 4-117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-117.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |