IL HB3508 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides for the licensure of naturopathic physicians. Makes conforming changes in various other Acts. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NATUROPATHIC PHYSICIANS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-16HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2016-09-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2016-09-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2016-05-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2016-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2015-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2015-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-10HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-26HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-6Amended CodeCitation Text
105526-1Amended CodeCitation Text
2039452Amended CodeCitation Text
2155122-1Amended CodeCitation Text
2256010Amended CodeCitation Text
2256011Amended CodeCitation Text
2256014Amended CodeCitation Text
2256015Amended CodeCitation Text
2256016Amended CodeCitation Text
2256017Amended CodeCitation Text
2256018Amended CodeCitation Text
2256019Amended CodeCitation Text
225602Amended CodeCitation Text
2256022Amended CodeCitation Text
2256024Amended CodeCitation Text
2256033Amended CodeCitation Text
2256034Amended CodeCitation Text
225607Amended CodeCitation Text
225608Amended CodeCitation Text
225609Amended CodeCitation Text
225615Amended CodeCitation Text
22563110Amended CodeCitation Text
2256325Amended CodeCitation Text
225901Amended CodeCitation Text
710152Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback