IL HB3504 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to administer an annual survey, which shall be named the Healthy Illinois Survey. Provides that the Healthy Illinois Survey shall: (1) include interviews of a sample of State residents such that statistically reliable data for specified areas can be developed, as well as statistically reliable data on racial, ethnic, gender, age, and other demographic groups of State residents important to inform health equity goals; (2) be collected at the zip code level; and (3) include questions on a range of topics designed to establish an initial baseline public health data set and annual updates. Provides that, in developing the annual Healthy Illinois Survey, the Department shall consult with specified persons and entities with the goal of a comprehensive survey that will assist the State and other partners in developing the data to measure public health and health equity. Requires the Department to provide the results of the Healthy Illinois Survey in forms useful to cities, communities, local health departments, hospitals, and other potential users, including annually publishing on its website data at the most granular geographic and demographic levels possible while protecting identifying information. Requires the Department to produce periodic special reports and analyses relevant to ongoing and emerging health and social issues in communities and the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-HEALTHY ILLINOIS SURVEY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25HouseSent to the Governor
2021-06-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
2021-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
2021-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass Healthcare Access and Availability; 007-000-000
2021-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2021-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-05-11SenateAssigned to Healthcare Access and Availability
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
2021-04-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-03-23HouseDo Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-431New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback