IL HB3495 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Requires restaurants to be aware of food allergy recalls from the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Requires restaurants to indicate on a placard, poster, or menu that consumers with food allergies should inform a waiter or waitress of the restaurant of their allergy. Sets forth the requirements for the placard or poster or menu information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD ALLERGEN INFORMATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-24HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2015-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 014-001-000
2015-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2015-03-10HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2015-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-26HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106255New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback