IL HB3488 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Disposition of Remains of the Indigent Act. Provides that if private funds are not available for the funeral or burial of a decedent, then State or local officials shall refer a family member, executor, or agent empowered to direct the disposition of a decedent's remains to the option of donating the remains to an institution of medical, mortuary, or other sciences on the registry created under the Act. Provides that such family member, executor, or agent shall be responsible for authorizing such use. Provides that unclaimed cadavers held by any State facility, hospital, institution, morgue, or other place for bodies of deceased persons may be turned over to an institution on the registry. Contains provisions requiring the directors of State facilities with possession of unclaimed human remains to make reasonable efforts to contact family and other responsible parties. Contains provisions concerning circumstances in which family or other responsible parties request the remains and situations when they fail to do so. Contains other provisions concerning what the State facility with humans remains shall do. Provides that the Department of Human Services may pay a funeral home or an institution of medical, mortuary, or other science an allowance for funeral and burial costs. Contains provisions concerning the disposition of the remains after use of the remains by a registered institution. Requires the Department of Public Health to maintain a registry of institutions qualifying as institutions of medical, mortuary, or other sciences eligible to receive donations under the Act. Contains provisions concerning requirements for the registry and granting the Department of Public Health rulemaking and other powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISPOSITION OF REMAINS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 093-003-003
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Brady
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 017-000-000
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-22SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-16SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-05-04SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-015-004
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
2017-03-08HouseRemains in Human Services Committee
2017-03-08HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Human Services Committee; 006-006-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-10HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410185Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3488&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3488.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3488eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3488enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3488ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3488ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3488sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3488_04282017_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB3488_05262017_042000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3488_06252017_024000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback