IL HB3483 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Removes language requiring the Department of Human Services to maintain a disability services database and instead requires the Department of Human Services to compile and maintain a Prioritization of Urgency of Need for Services (PUNS) database of Illinois residents with an intellectual disability or a developmental disability, including an autism spectrum disorder, and Illinois residents with an intellectual disability or a developmental disability who are also diagnosed with a physical disability or mental illness and are in need of disability services funded by the Department. Provides that the PUNS database shall be used to foster a fair and orderly process for: (i) processing applications for services funded by the Department, (ii) verifying information, (iii) keeping individuals and families who have applied for services informed of available services and anticipated wait times, (iv) determining unmet need, and (v) informing the General Assembly and the Governor of unmet need statewide and within each representative district. Requires the Secretary of Human Services to seek input from specified advisory bodies and committees with regard to the establishment, maintenance, and administration of PUNS. Contains provisions concerning the type of information to be collected and maintained for PUNS; the Department's development of a web-based verification and information-update application; notice of services to individuals listed in the PUNS database; and other matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-PUNS DATABASE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0284
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-04-10HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20130510-26Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback