IL HB3471 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to develop and maintain a uniform accounting and reporting system for the receipts and expenditures of school districts. Provides that the accounting records maintained by each district must be coordinated with the uniform accounting system. Requires each district to record the receipts and expenditures of the district in accordance with a uniform classification of accounts or chart of accounts and reports as prescribed by the State Board. Requires each district to submit such reports and statements as may be required by the State Board. Requires the State Board to design, revise, and direct the use of accounting records and fiscal procedures and prescribe uniform classifications for receipts and expenditures for all districts. Sets forth requirements for the accounting system. Provides that the State Board shall prescribe the necessary forms to be used by districts in connection with the uniform accounting system.
Title
SCH CD-UNIFORM ACCT SYSTEM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-03-01 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3471&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3471.htm |