IL HB3470 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Requires Voters Identification Cards for those who do not have an acceptable photo ID. Sets forth requirements and exemptions. Provides that any person desiring to vote shall present to the judges of election for verification of the person's identity a government-issued photo identification card or his or her Voter Identification Card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTIONS VOTER PHOTO ID

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseTo Ballot Access Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-14New CodeSee Bill Text
10517-9Amended CodeCitation Text
10518-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10518A-15Amended CodeCitation Text
10518A-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10519A-35Amended CodeCitation Text
1053-7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback