IL HB3469 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Reinforces that a vehicle operated by a fire chief, a chief of police of a municipality, a sheriff of a county, or a chief emergency medical services officer may be equipped with a siren, whistle, or bell capable of emitting sound audible under normal conditions from a distance of not less than 500 feet.
Title
VEH CD-POLICE&FIRE VEHS-SIREN
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. David Harris [R] |
Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0182 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |