IL HB3463 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning an exemption for veterans with disabilities who qualify for Specially Adapted Housing, increases the maximum assessed value of the property from $100,000 to $150,000. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-VETERANS
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Ozinga [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Brandun Schweizer [R] | Rep. Mike Coffey [R] |
Rep. Nicole La Ha [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2023-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2023-08-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3463&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3463.htm |