IL HB3462 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that a school district may include in its curriculum a unit of instruction on hunting education that includes instruction on hunting safety. Requires the State Board of Education to prepare and make available to school boards instructional materials that may be used as guidelines for development of a unit of instruction on hunting education. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-HUNTING ED COURSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0152
2019-07-26HouseEffective Date July 26, 2019
2019-07-26HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Education; 010-002-000
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Education
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-04-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-04-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-03-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-23.13New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback