IL HB3462 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Pharmacy Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation of any change of address or email address through specified means. Provides for the licensure (rather than registration) of registered pharmacy technicians, registered certified pharmacy technicians, and pharmacists, and makes conforming changes. Removes provision allowing each member of the State Board of Pharmacy to receive a per diem payment in an amount determined from time to time by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation for attendance at meetings of the Board and conducting other official business of the Board. Changes references to "Director" to references to "Secretary" or "Department" throughout the Act. Eliminates the position of deputy pharmacy coordinator. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions, duties of the Department, inactive status, pharmacists in charge, nonresident pharmacy licenses, record retention, automated pharmacy systems, remote prescription processing, and discipline. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHARMACY PRACTICE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 099-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2017-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2258510Amended CodeCitation Text
2258511Amended CodeCitation Text
2258512Amended CodeCitation Text
2258513Amended CodeCitation Text
2258515Amended CodeCitation Text
2258516Amended CodeCitation Text
2258516aAmended CodeCitation Text
2258517Amended CodeCitation Text
2258517.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2258518Amended CodeCitation Text
2258519Amended CodeCitation Text
2258520Amended CodeCitation Text
2258522Amended CodeCitation Text
2258522bAmended CodeCitation Text
2258525.10Amended CodeCitation Text
2258525.15Amended CodeCitation Text
2258527Amended CodeCitation Text
2258528Amended CodeCitation Text
225853Amended CodeCitation Text
225853.5New CodeSee Bill Text
2258530Amended CodeCitation Text
2258530.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2258532Amended CodeCitation Text
2258533Amended CodeCitation Text
2258534Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.12Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.13Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.14Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.15Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.16Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.18Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.20New CodeSee Bill Text
2258535.21New CodeSee Bill Text
2258535.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.6Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.7Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.8Amended CodeCitation Text
2258536Amended CodeCitation Text
225855.5Amended CodeCitation Text
225857Amended CodeCitation Text
225859Amended CodeCitation Text
225859.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3462&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3462.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3462eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3462enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3462ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3462ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3462ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3462ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3462sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3462_04282017_034000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB3462_05252017_077000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3462_06252017_023000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback