IL HB3460 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a county board's use of tax moneys.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Long [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. David Welter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-04-07 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-003-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Re-assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 5-701.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |