IL HB3455 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides in the Department of Natural Resource's Adopt-A-Park program that volunteers may assist with vegetation management, providing building and facility repair, or other appropriate services. Creates the Adopt-A-Trail Program. Provides that the Department shall establish and maintain Adopt-A-Trail programs with individual or group volunteers, if requested by an individual or group volunteers, in an effort to reduce and remove litter from trails and to provide other services. Provides that the Department shall retain the ability to approve or deny an individual or group volunteer's request; however, the Department must state the reason for the request denial. Provides that by engaging in volunteer activities under the Act, volunteers fully acknowledge and understand that there shall be neither a (1) promise or expectation of compensation of any type, including benefits, nor (2) creation of an employer-employee relationship. Makes other changes.
Title
DNR-VOLUNTEERS-TRAIL PROGRAM
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] |
Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0180 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 805 | 63a41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 805 | 805-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 805 | 805-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |