IL HB3452 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act by extending the repeal date of the Podiatric Medical Practice Act of 1987 from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Podiatric Medical Practice Act of 1987. Defines "email address of record" and "address of record". Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation of any change of address or email address through specified means. Makes changes in provisions concerning the Podiatric Medical Licensing Board, grounds for disciplinary action, appointment of a hearing officer, and certification of records. Provides provisions concerning confidentiality of information collected by the Department in the course of an examination or investigation. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PODIATRY PRACTICE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-11-09SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-11-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-002-000
2017-11-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-11-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 8, 2017
2017-11-07SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-003-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22510012Amended CodeCitation Text
22510014Amended CodeCitation Text
22510015Amended CodeCitation Text
22510019Amended CodeCitation Text
22510020Repealed CodeCitation Text
22510024Amended CodeCitation Text
22510026Amended CodeCitation Text
22510027Amended CodeCitation Text
2251003Amended CodeCitation Text
22510034Amended CodeCitation Text
22510036Amended CodeCitation Text
22510039Repealed CodeCitation Text
22510040Amended CodeCitation Text
22510042Amended CodeCitation Text
22510046New CodeSee Bill Text
2251005Amended CodeCitation Text
2251005.5New CodeSee Bill Text
2251007Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback