IL HB3450 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that beginning on January 1, 2012, the State Commission shall send, through electronic mail, all licensees a reminder of the date each State license expires. Provides that the State Commission shall notify each licensee through electronic mail 30 days prior to the expiration date of his or her license. Provides that the State Commission is not required to comply with this notification requirement if the licensee does not provide the State Commission his or her electronic mail address. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR - RENEWAL NOTIFICATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 87 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-01HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1166
2013-03-01HouseEffective Date March 1, 2013
2013-03-01HouseGovernor Approved
2013-01-11HouseSent to the Governor
2013-01-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2013-01-08HousePassed Both Houses
2013-01-08HouseHouse Concurs
2013-01-08HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 087-025-000
2013-01-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2013-01-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2013-01-06HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2013-01-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2013-01-06HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2013-01-06HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frank J. Mautino
2013-01-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2013-01-04HouseArrived in House
2013-01-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-005-000
2013-01-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2013-01-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mu
2013-01-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2013-01-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2013-01-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2013-01-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2013-01-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Mu
2013-01-02SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013
2013-01-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 3, 2013
2013-01-02SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2012-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2012-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012
2012-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2012
2012-05-16SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2011-07-23SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2011-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011
2011-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2011-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011
2011-05-05SenateDo Pass Executive; 013-000-000
2011-04-27SenateAssigned to Executive
2011-04-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2011-04-22SenateFirst Reading
2011-04-22SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu
2011-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2011-04-22SenateArrive in Senate
2011-04-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000
2011-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2011-03-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2011-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2011-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2011-03-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2011-02-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2011-02-24HouseFirst Reading
2011-02-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23557-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23557-15New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback