IL HB3449 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Geolocation Privacy Protection Act. Defines "geolocation information", "location-based application", and "private entity". Provides that a private entity may not collect, use, store, or disclose geolocation information from a location-based application on a person's device unless the private entity first receives the person's affirmative express consent after complying with specified notice requirements. Provides exceptions. Provides that a person whose rights are violated may recover: (1) liquidated damages of $1,000 or actual damages, whichever is greater; (2) reasonable attorney's fees and costs; and (3) other relief, including an injunction, as the court may deem appropriate. Provides that authority to seek remedies and impose penalties granted to the Attorney General under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act is also granted to the Attorney General for the enforcement of the Geolocation Privacy Protection Act. Provides that in any action brought by the Attorney General to enforce the Act, the court may order that persons who incurred actual damages be awarded 3 times the amount at which actual damages are assessed. Provides that a violation of the Act constitutes an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that the provisions of the Act may not be waived. Contains applicability language. Makes a corresponding change in the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GEOLOCATION PRIVACY PROTECTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-30HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 006-004-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052ZAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback