IL HB3449 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Math and Science Academy for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2013, as follows: General Funds $25,918,400; Other State Funds $4,080,000; Federal Funds $5,500,000; Total $35,498,400.
Title
$BHE FY14 OCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-06-30 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2013-08-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3449&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/PDF/09800HB3449.pdf |