IL HB3440 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the corporate authorities of a municipality may provide for the establishment or maintenance of community policing centers, or may enter into contractual agreements with other entities for the establishment or maintenance of community policing centers, in high crime areas. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall provide grants of $100,000, subject to appropriation, to municipalities for the establishment or maintenance of community policing centers and that the Department shall adopt rules relating to the application process and eligibility requirements to receive such grants.
Title
MUNI-COMMUNITY POLICING CENTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |