IL HB3440 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that provisions prohibiting the offer for sale of any bulk food in a manner other than to prevent direct handling of such items by the consumer shall not prohibit self-service by consumers provided that take-home containers, including bags, cups, and lids, provided for consumer use are stored and dispensed in a sanitary manner. Provides that a retailer may allow a consumer to fill or refill a personal container with bulk food if the dispensers used prevent the direct handling of the bulk food. Provides that county health departments and municipalities shall not prohibit the ability of a retailer to allow a consumer to fill or refill a personal container with bulk food if the dispensers used prevent the direct handling of the bulk food.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BULK FOOD HANDLING-CONTAINERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0510
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-17HouseArrived in House
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-006-000
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 025-000-000
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106203.15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback