IL HB3434 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Residential Real Property Disclosure Act. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of a Section requiring a seller to deliver the disclosure statement to the buyer, upon signing and dating the disclosure report, the prospective buyer accepts and acknowledges that the prospective buyer has received the residential real property disclosure report form in its entirety, including the disclosure report and a copy of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAL ESTATE DISCLOSURE-RECEIPT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7657720Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback