IL HB3421 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Abolishes monetary bail, except under the Uniform Criminal Extradition Act. Provides that the court may employ the use of a validated risk assessment tool in certain instances at pre-trial release hearings. Amends the Clerks of Court Act. Provides that on the first day of each month, the clerk of the court shall prepare and file with the Supreme Court a report of the pre-trial release hearings completed within the previous month. This report shall include for each arrestee ordered released and detained the following: the offense for which the was arrestee was charged, and the judge issuing the pre-trial decision. Provides that the clerk of court shall compile a quarterly report to be published for the public on the website of the Supreme Court and each circuit court's website, or if the circuit court does not have a website, on the website of the county. The quarterly report is to include, but is not limited to, the number of arrests by county, the number of cases prosecuted in the circuit court, an analysis of the percentage of arrestees detained by offense type, an analysis of the types of pre-trial release conditions by offense type, the rate of willful failure to appear, and the percentage of arrestees found to have committed violent felonies on release. Amends the Pretrial Services Act. Provides that pretrial service agencies shall provide reminders to defendants of upcoming court dates via phone or messaging and offer transportation assistance for indigent defendants. Amends various other Acts to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-POSTING BAIL ABOLISH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625516-103Amended CodeCitation Text
70510514Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3aAmended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3bAmended CodeCitation Text
70510527.5Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.6Amended CodeCitation Text
720532-10Amended CodeCitation Text
72518520Amended CodeCitation Text
72518522Amended CodeCitation Text
72518534Amended CodeCitation Text
7251857Amended CodeCitation Text
72522516Amended CodeCitation Text
7255102-7Repealed CodeCitation Text
7255103-5Amended CodeCitation Text
7255103-7Amended CodeCitation Text
7255104-17Amended CodeCitation Text
7255106D-1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255107-4Amended CodeCitation Text
7255109-1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255109-2Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-1.5New CodeSee Bill Text
7255110-10Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-11Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-12Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-13Repealed CodeCitation Text
7255110-14Repealed CodeCitation Text
7255110-15Repealed CodeCitation Text
7255110-16Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-17Repealed CodeCitation Text
7255110-18Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-2Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-3Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-4Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-5Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-5.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-6Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-6.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-6.2Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-6.3Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-6.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
7255110-7Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-8Repealed CodeCitation Text
7255110-9Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-23Amended CodeCitation Text
7255115-4.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7301303Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-4Amended CodeCitation Text
74022220Amended CodeCitation Text
75060223Amended CodeCitation Text
75060301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback