IL HB3396 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teachers Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides for a one-time increase in certain retirement and survivor's annuities. Declares it to be the public policy of this State and the intention of the General Assembly to protect annuitants against significant decreases in the purchasing power of retirement and survivor's annuities. Directs the retirement system to review and report on significant changes in purchasing power. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-PURCHASING POWER INCRS
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-119.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3396&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3396.htm |