IL HB3393 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Imposes a privilege tax at a rate of 20% on partnerships and S corporations engaged in the business of conducting investment management services, until such time as a federal law with an identical effect has been enacted. Provides for the determination of the tax due; defines "investment management services". Effective immediately.
Title
INC TAX-INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2017-03-23 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-002-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-09 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |