IL HB3392 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that criminal history record information of certain specified convictions shall automatically receive limited access when completion of court ordered financial obligations of the sentence has occurred and 10 years have passed since the most recent misdemeanor or felony conviction. Provides that if a person's case receives limited access not in accordance law or a person receiving limited access is subsequently convicted of a misdemeanor or felony, the State's Attorney of the county in which the underlying or subsequent conviction took place or the Attorney General, if the Attorney General obtained the conviction for the underlying conviction, shall have standing to challenge the limited access granted by the court. Provides that the Department of State Police may object under certain circumstances. Provides that an offense provided limited access may not be considered a conviction that would prohibit the employment of a person under State or federal law that prohibits employment based on State convictions to the extent permitted by federal law. Makes other changes.
Title
LIMITED ACCESS-CRIMINAL RECORD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3392&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3392.htm |