IL HB3392 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-25HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-001-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-09HouseRe-assigned to Human Services Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210451-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback