IL HB3391 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning payment rates for nursing facilities, provides that facility-specific staffing levels and wages paid (rather than regional wage adjusters based on the Health Service Areas (HSA) groupings and adjusters in effect on April 30, 2012) shall be one of the factors in determining the new nursing services reimbursement methodology utilizing the RUG-IV 48 grouper model. Sets forth the calculation of the facility-specific RUG-IV nursing component per diem rate for dates of service beginning July 1, 2017. Provides that certain staffing and wage adjusters must be updated each quarter using the staffing hours and wage data from Payroll Benefit Journal data collected by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for the same time period of Minimum Date Set data used to calculate the RUG-IV acuity case weight. Sets forth how to calculate each facility's "total per resident per day staffing wage cost". Provides that the levels used to assign certain staffing and wage adjusters shall be calculated using the staffing ratios required under the Nursing Home Care Act multiplied by the Illinois mean hourly wage for the equivalent occupational code and title assigned by the U.S. Bureau of Labor Statistics and reported in the May 2014 State Occupational Employment and Wage Estimates for Illinois. Provides that beginning July 1, 2017 and quarterly thereafter, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services may adjust, by administrative rule and within certain parameters established under the Code, a specific staffing and wage adjuster described in the Code for the purpose of keeping liability created by the facility-specific RUG-IV nursing component per diem rates stable. Permits the Department to adopt rules to implement these provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-PAYMENT RATES
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-23 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3391&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3391.htm |