IL HB3378 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning interest of board members in contracts, sets forth additional exemptions from the provisions if the board member maintains less than a 1% share in the ownership of the company with which the school district is attempting to contract and the board member discloses and recuses himself or herself from the deliberations. Sets forth provisions concerning when a board member shall be deemed interested.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-INTERESTED BOARD MEMBER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-04-06HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-002-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback