IL HB3375 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tattoo and Body Piercing Establishment Registration Act. Defines "person". Provides that the Department of Public Health is authorized to establish and assess penalties or fines against any person who violates the Act or rules adopted under the Act (instead of "a registrant for violations of this Act or regulations adopted under this Act"). Throughout the Act, replaces references to "owner" with "operator". Provides that the operator of an establishment (rather than "an establishment") must meet specified operating requirements. Provides that the Department of Public Health may assess a late fee if the renewal application and renewal fee are not submitted on or before the registration expiration date. Provides that in no circumstance will any penalties or fines exceed $1,000 per day for each day the violation continues (instead of "for each day the registrant remains in violation").
Title
TATTOO&PIERCING PARLOR REGIST
Sponsors
Rep. John Anthony [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0117 |
2015-07-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-001 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 54 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 54 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 54 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 54 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 54 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 54 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |