IL HB3356 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that for a person who is a resident in a facility licensed under the ID/DD Community Care Act, the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act, or the MC/DD Act for whom payments are made throughout a month and who is determined to be eligible for medical assistance, the State shall pay an amount in addition to the minimum monthly personal needs allowance authorized under the Social Security Act so that the person's total monthly personal needs allowance from both State and federal sources equals $60. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3356&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3356.htm |