IL HB3349 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that the Board of Higher Education shall award a grant to a statewide association of public pension funds affiliated with a public institution of higher education to develop and deliver an in-person financial literacy training program for public employees. Provides that the program shall consist of in-person training regarding retirement income, including pension benefits, Social Security benefits, and employer-sponsored deferred compensation and retiree healthcare savings plans and shall also include instruction in financial planning and important elements of consumer finance, such as debt, educational savings, budgeting, and related subjects. Provides that the program shall include recorded programs to assist public employees who work on nontraditional shift assignments.
Title
EMPLOYEE FINANCIAL LITERACY
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-039-001 |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 007-004-000 |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Re-assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |