IL HB3349 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the organization of the Department of Corrections and the Department of Juvenile Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-2-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback