IL HB3342 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chuck Weaver
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to consider certain mitigating factors and evidence of rehabilitation for certain applicants of licenses, certificates, and registrations. Requires the Department, upon denial of a license, certificate, or registration, to provide the applicant certain information concerning the denial. Provides that no application for licensure or registration shall be denied by reason of a finding of lack of good moral character when the finding is based solely upon the fact that the applicant has one or more previous convictions. Provides that the Department shall not require applicants to report certain criminal history information and the Department shall not consider the information. Provides that on May 1 of each year, the Department shall prepare, publicly announce, and publish certain statistical information. Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Includes applications for license, certification, and registration that must contain specific language which states that the applicant is not obligated to disclose sealed or expunged records of conviction or arrest and entities authorized to grant professional licenses, certifications, and registrations that may not ask if an applicant has had records expunged or sealed. Provides that certain sealed or impounded felony records shall not be disseminated in connection with an application for a professional or business license, except specified health care worker licenses. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DFPR-CRIMINAL HISTORY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-002-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-052-000
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-001-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-29HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-29HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-29HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-03-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-08HouseTo Business Licenses Subcommittee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2021052105-130Amended CodeCitation Text
2021052105-131New CodeSee Bill Text
2021052105-135Amended CodeCitation Text
2021052105-205Amended CodeCitation Text
2021052105-207Amended CodeCitation Text
20210560.3Amended CodeCitation Text
20263012Amended CodeCitation Text
20263013Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback