IL HB3338 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board must review the law enforcement, correctional, or court security officer's (currently, police officer) conduct and records to ensure that no officer is certified or provided a valid waiver if that officer has been convicted of a felony offense under the laws of this State or any other state which if committed in this State would be punishable as a felony. Provides that appointed investigators shall be vested with full police powers and authorized to conduct criminal background inquiries using a recognized national law enforcement database or an independent background investigation. Provides that the Board must also ensure that no officer is certified or provided a valid waiver if that officer has been convicted of aggravated battery, domestic battery, violation of an order of protection, or interfering with the reporting of domestic violence, or an offense that would be similar in any other state. Provides that the Peace Officer and Probation Officer Firearm Training Act shall not be subject to home rule preemption under Article VII of the Illinois Constitution. Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that active and retired law enforcement officers authorized to carry a firearm under the laws of this State or federal law are not subject to a provision providing that the owner of private real property of any type may prohibit the carrying of concealed firearms on the property under his or her control, but that the owner must post a sign in accordance with the Act indicating that firearms are prohibited on the property, unless the property is a private residence. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
DECERTIFICATION-ENFORCEMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 15 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 10.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 6.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 710 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |