IL HB3335 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Carryout Bag Fee Act. Provides that a carryout bag fee of $0.10 is imposed on each carryout bag used by a customer at retail establishments, except in municipalities with a population greater than 1,000,000, with $0.03 being returned to the retail establishment, $0.04 into the Carryout Bag Fee Fund, $0.01 to the Prairie Research Institute of the University of Illinois, $0.01 into the Solid Waste Management Fund, and $0.01 into the Partners for Conservation Fund. Provides that the carryout bag fee does not apply to the retail sale or use of carryout bags that are used to carry items purchased under specified governmental food assistance programs. Repeals the new Act on January 1, 2026. Amends the State Finance Act making conforming changes. Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county or municipality may not ban, place a fee or tax on, or regulate in any other manner the use, disposition, content, taxation, or sale of carryout bags. Limits the applicability of the provisions as they relate to a county or municipality that charged a fee or tax on carryout bags on February 1, 2018 and specified recycling programs. Limits home rule powers.
Title
CARRYOUT BAG FEE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-05 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1184 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-42-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3335&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3335.htm |