IL HB3324 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides for dyslexia screening guidelines and rules. Requires the State Board of Education to provide technical assistance for specific learning disabilities to school districts. Provides that, beginning with the 2021-2022 school year, each school district must screen students in grades kindergarten through second for the risk factors of dyslexia using a universal screener. Sets forth what the screening must include. Provides for additional screening for a student who is determined to be at risk, or at some risk, for dyslexia to determine if the student has the characteristics of dyslexia. Requires the use of a multi-tiered system of support framework if screening indicates that a student has some risk factors for dyslexia or has the characteristics of dyslexia. Sets forth provisions concerning exceptions to screening, dyslexia intervention services, and reporting. Effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DYSLEXIA SCREENING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2021-03-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.73New CodeSee Bill Text
10552-3.161Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.67New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback