IL HB3322 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to criminal history records checks and checks of the Statewide Sex Offender Database and Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database, provides that if a substitute teacher who (i) is a retired educator with a Professional Educator License, (ii) has been issued a certificate concerning those checks by a regional superintendent of schools, and (iii) is seeking employment in another educational service region presents the certificate to the regional superintendent of that other educational service region, then the regional superintendent of that other educational service region shall issue its own certificate to the substitute teacher without requiring the substitute teacher to have another criminal history records check or check of the Statewide Sex Offender Database or Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database performed as a condition of employment as a substitute teacher with a school district in that other educational service region. Effective immediately.
Title
SUBSTITUTE TEACHER-CRIM CHECK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-13 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-13 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 003-004-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-21.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |